United States Of America v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Benjamin Jones, Michelle Yu, Office of Tax Collector San Mateo County, National City Mortgage Company, Unifund CCR Partners, Employment Development Department State of California, Franchise Tax Board State of California and Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00796
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 65 Motion for Judgment.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT MICHELLE YU. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 3, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FORECLOSURE SALE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 20, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 4, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AS TO LIEN PRIORITY BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND PNC MORTGAGE (FKA NATIONAL CITY MORTGAGE), A DIVISION OF PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 3, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT YUS MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIENS OR OTHER CLAIMS OF INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 15, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR GOVERNMENT RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 5, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 8, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 20, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO ADD PARTY, SELL PROPERTY, AND DISTRIBUTE PROCEEDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Tax Collector San Mateo County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employment Development Department State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchise Tax Board State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?