Steinhart v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Sally Steinhart
Defendant: County of Sonoma, Bill Cogbill, M. Shanahan, Carolyn Zoe, Jo Weber, Carol Bauer, Robin Smith and California Department of Social Services
Case Number: 3:2010cv00841
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S THIRD REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 01:30 PM and Further Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 11/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case Referred to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 54 TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE; EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULES; AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 52 TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE AND EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULES AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 36 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/16/11. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011) Modified on 2/16/2011 (cl, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND COUNTY DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE AN ANTI-SLAPP MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 5 TO PERMIT FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND EXTEND COUNTY DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinhart v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Steinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Cogbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Zoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?