Gates v. Carquest Corporation
Plaintiff: Archie Lee Gates
Defendant: Carquest Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00972
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/21/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT CARQUEST CORPORATION re 51 Stipulation filed by Carquest Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/17/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CARQUEST CORPORATION'S REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE IN THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/12/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/5/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Carquest Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Lee Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carquest Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?