Concorde Equity II, LLC v. Kenneth Alfred Miller et al
Plaintiff: Concorde Equity II, LLC
Defendant: Kenneth Alfred Miller, George Cresson, Loanvest XII, L.P., Sentinel Investment Management Company, South Bay Real Estate Commerce Group, LLC, Peter Scott Carter, Jr. and Old Republic Title Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv01041
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/7/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating trial date, mandatory settlement conference date, and continuing hearing on motion for summary judgment from 5/27/11 to 8/26/11. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/11/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/21/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Setting August 23, 2010 as Hearing Date for Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/8/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 17 Motion to Appoint Receiver. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/5/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concorde Equity II, LLC v. Kenneth Alfred Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concorde Equity II, LLC
Represented By: James L. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Alfred Miller
Represented By: Timothy A. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Cresson
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loanvest XII, L.P.
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Investment Management Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bay Real Estate Commerce Group, LLC
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Scott Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?