Aniel et al v. Aurora Loan Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fermin Solis Aniel and Erlinda Abibas Aniel
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Quality Loan Services Corp and McCarthy and Holthus LLP
Case Number: 3:2010cv01042
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Order granting 198 stipulation to continue settlement conference. Settlement conference set for 12/8/2014 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 08/21/14. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/20/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 186 STIPULATION W>To Continue Case Management Conference and Hearing re Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING 165 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 28, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 172 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 27, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 169 STIPULATION re Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 29, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING 161 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference.Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 2, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER FOLLOWING REMAND, DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/27/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/4/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING 113 Plaintiffs' Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/29/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 AMENDED JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re Plaintiffs' Application for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/27/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/29/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DIMISS FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDUL ON QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/9/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/10/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/16/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Hearing on Ex Parte Request for Immediate Injunctive Relief set for 3/17/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/11/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aniel et al v. Aurora Loan Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fermin Solis Aniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlinda Abibas Aniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy and Holthus LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?