Rafton v. Rydex Series Funds et al
Plaintiff: James Rafton
Defendant: Rydex Series Funds, Padco Advisors Inc., Rydex Distributors, I c., Richard M. Goldman, Carl G. Verboncoeur, John O. Demaret, Nick Bonos, Michael P. Byrum, Corey A. Colehour, J. Kenneth Dalton, Werner E. Keller, Thomas F. Lydon, Patrick T. McCarville and Roger Somers
Case Number: 3:2010cv01171
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 136 Lead Counsel's Application for Distribution.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 104 Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; Final Judgment; and Order of Dismissal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Authorizing Further Progress Payment to Claims Administrator. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/9/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Continuing Final Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/5/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re 101 Stipulation Regarding Production of Customer Data by Merrill Lynch. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 95 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re 89 Adopting Joint Stipulation to Extend Certain Case Deadlines. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/27/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying 85 Motion for Leave to File to File Motion for Reconsideration; Denying 86 Motion to Amend/Correct the January 5, 2011 Order to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/2/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 60 Application of David C. Blickenstaff for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/25/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference for March 23, 2011 at 2pm and Setting Deadline of February 4, 2011 to file Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/10/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 39 and 42 Denying in part and Granting in part Defendants' motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/5/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to 12/16/2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/8/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 12 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying 18 Motion to Transfer Case (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for extension of time and rescheduling CMC re 8 Stipulation, filed by Rydex Series Funds, Richard M. Goldman, Michael P. Byrum, Nick Bonos, Rydex Distributors, I c., Carl G. Verboncoeur, Padco Advisors Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/3/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafton v. Rydex Series Funds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rafton
Represented By: Marc Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rydex Series Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padco Advisors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rydex Distributors, I c.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl G. Verboncoeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O. Demaret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Bonos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Byrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey A. Colehour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Kenneth Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick T. McCarville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?