Zorro Productions, Inc v. Mars, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: BBDO Worldwide, Inc. and Mars, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zorro Productions, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv01179
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 30 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 29 STIPULATION Of Dismissal With Prejudice by Zorro Productions, Inc. (Libenson, Ross) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 28 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 8/31/10 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 712-775-7300 and use access code 847955. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
June 21, 2010 27 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byBBDO Worldwide, Inc.,, Mars, Inc.. (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 26 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Zorro Productions, Inc. (Libenson, Ross) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/22/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2010 25 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants time to respond to Plaintiffs complaint to 6/21/10. THIS IS THE LAST EXTENSION THAT WILL BE GRANTED (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 7, 2010 24 STIPULATION Extending The Time by Which Defendants Must Respond to the Complaint by BBDO Worldwide, Inc.,, Mars, Inc.. (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 2, 2010 23 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint from 5/24/10 to 6/7/10 (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 22 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/10 is continued to 9/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/2/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 5/24/10 (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 25, 2010 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by BBDO Worldwide, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Omnicom Group, Inc. for BBDO Worldwide, Inc.,. (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mars, Inc. (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options -Mars (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options -BBDO (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 24, 2010 16 STIPULATION [CORRECTED] Extending The Time by Which Defendants Must Respond to the Complaint by BBDO Worldwide, Inc.,, Mars, Inc.. (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 24, 2010 15 STIPULATION Extending The Time By Which Defendants Must Respond to the Complaint by BBDO Worldwide, Inc.,, Mars, Inc.. (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 17, 2010 14 STIPULATION , Declaration In Support Of Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and [proposed] Order Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Case Schedule by Zorro Productions, Inc. (Libenson, Ross) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 12, 2010 13 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Libenson, Ross) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by parties and counsel (Libenson, Ross) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 10, 2010 11 STIPULATION Extending the Time by which Defendants Must Respond to the Complaint by BBDO Worldwide, Inc.,, Mars, Inc.. (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 23, 2010 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zorro Productions, Inc Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons (Libenson, Ross) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 20, 2010 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cryan FOR DEFENDANT MARS INCORPORATED (Cryan, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 22, 2010 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to BBDO Worldwide, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Mars, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Samuel Conti on 3/22/10. (Attachments: # 1 SC Standing Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 1 COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against BBDO Worldwide, Inc.,, Mars, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 44611004956.). Filed byZorro Productions, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zorro Productions, Inc v. Mars, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBDO Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorro Productions, Inc
Represented By: Ross L. Libenson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?