Collins v. GameStop Corp. et al
Plaintiff: James Collins
Defendant: GameStop Corp., GameStop.com, Inc., B&N GameStop Holding Corp. and Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01210
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 116 Motion for attorneys' fees and 118 Motion for final approval of class action settlement. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing dates regarding class notice and related proceedings re 112 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/19/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 103 Motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Further ORDER Re: Supplemental Briefing on 103 MOTION for preliminary approval of class action settlement. Parties shall file a further joint supplemental brief by 04/04/12 addressing a question unanswered by 108 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/02/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re: supplemental briefing on 103 MOTION for preliminary approval of class action settlement. Motion hearing set for 04/02/12 is vacated. Parties to submit joint filing pursuant to this order by 03/30/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/23/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying without prejudice 83 Defendants' motion for leave to submit evidence from mediation proceedings. The parties shall return to Judge Infante for a final opinion on whether a settlement was reached through mediation. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying re 71 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Motion for Protective Order from Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte to Chief Magistratre Judge Maria-Elena James. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/3/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson vacating (47) Motion to Consolidate Cases in Collins as moot. Amended complaint in Collins and stipulated dismissal in Proctor shall be filed by 05/25/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re: May 16, 2011 hearing. Counsel in both Collins and Proctor shall appear at the 05/16/11 hearing and be prepared to address all relevant issues, including those specifically set out in this order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/10/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER Removing Case from Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/22/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/09/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: deadline for early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/1/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/14/10. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 20 Defendants' Motion to strike class allegations. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER continuing case management conference to 09/13/10 at 1:30 PM. The parties shall file a joint case management conference statement on or before 09/03/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/27/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: extension of time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/20/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/15/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. GameStop Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Collins
Represented By: Jennifer Sheryl Grock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GameStop Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GameStop.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&N GameStop Holding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?