Haynie et al v. City of Pleasanton et al

Plaintiff: Mark Aaron Haynie, Calguns Foundation, Inc. and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: City of Pleasanton, City of Pleasanton Police Department and California Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2010cv01255
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
June 18, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 6/21/13 is continued to 9/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/17/13., Motions terminated: 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to reset Case Management Conference filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Mark Aaron Haynie, Calguns Foundation, Inc., Brendan John Richards. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
April 1, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 4/2/13 is continued to 6/21/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/1/13., Motions terminated: 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to reset CMC filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Mark Aaron Haynie, Calguns Foundation, Inc., Brendan John Richards.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 5, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/13 is continued to 4/5/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/4/13., Motions terminated: 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to reset CMC filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Mark Aaron Haynie, Calguns Foundation, Inc., Brendan John Richards. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
October 29, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 12-0452 SI Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/12 is continued 2/8/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/26/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
July 25, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/12 is continued to 8/24/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco., Motions terminated: (36 in 3:11-cv-02493-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Management file d by The Calguns Foundation, Inc., The Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Brendan John Richards, (59 in 3:10-cv-01255-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Management filed by California Department of Justice, Kamala Harris.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/24/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
June 21, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing 6/29/12 case mgt conference to 7/27/12, Motions terminated: (57 in 3:10-cv-01255-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Management filed by California Department of Justice, Kamala Harris. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Illston on 6/21/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
May 22, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue 5/25/12 conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/19/12., Motions terminated: (9 in 3:12-cv-00452-SI) STIPULATION WI TH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Management filed by The Calguns Foundation, Inc., Max Joseph Plog-Horowitz, The Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., (21 in 3:11-cv-05580-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Management filed by The Calguns Foundation, Inc., The Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Brendan John Richards, (55 in 3:10-cv-01255-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Management filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Mark Aaron Haynie, Calguns Foundation, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
March 20, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: (18 in 3:11-cv-05580-SI) STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ETC. filed by Greg Myers, Sonoma County Sheriff's Office. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012) Modified on 3/20/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2012 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 21, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Related Case by Calguns Foundation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
November 23, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Additional Time to Plead to Consolidated Amended Complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
October 22, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating cases and motion hearing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 8, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion to relate case and setting 8/5/11 @ 2:30 p.m. for the initial case management conference. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
March 9, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: First Amended Complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
January 24, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
October 12, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 2/4/11 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 1, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court corrected ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 1/21/11 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
June 15, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Pleasanton and Pleasanton Police Dept. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynie et al v. City of Pleasanton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Aaron Haynie
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calguns Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pleasanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pleasanton Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?