Kronzer v. Hintz
Plaintiff: Tim Kronzer
Defendant: Gary Hintz
Case Number: 3:2010cv01270
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 102 Ex Parte Application (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 88 Motion for Attorney Fees (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/10/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman finding as moot 56 Motion to Continue (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/31/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/17/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/4/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/14/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating 35 Motion to Strike ; denying 24 Motion for Sanctions (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/21/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/7/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kronzer v. Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Kronzer
Represented By: Thomas Dewey Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?