IO Group, Inc. et al v. GLBT, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc., Channel One Releasing, Inc. and Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.
Defendant: GLBT, Ltd., Mash and New, Ltd., Port 80, Ltd., Steven John Compton and David Graham Compton
Case Number: 3:2010cv01282
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor GLBT Limited & Judgment Debtor Mash & New Limited in the amount of $1,787,747.42 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR FILING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND ORDER THEREON. No later than October 26, 2012 plaintiffs shall file their supplemental brief; no later than November 9, 2012, defendants shall file any oppositions; and the hearing is continued to November 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 17, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF LIBERTY MEDIA HOLDINGS, LLC. Liberty Media Holdings, LLC's request to substitute Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP in place of Randazza Group as counsel of record is granted. Attorney Marc John Randazza terminated as counsel for Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. The Case Management Conference scheduled for August 10, 2012 is vacated. Plaintiffs are directed to file, no later than August 10, 2012, proof of service of the motion for summary judgment on the individual defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING on 131 MOTION for Sanctions AGAINST DEFENDANTS COUNSEL JONATHAN CAPP filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC., IO Group, Inc., Channel One Releasing, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/11/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER APPOINTING SCOTT RABER AS RECEIVER IN SUBSTITUTION OF ANNE BRADLEY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 10, 2012 to April 13, 2012, at 10:30 a.m. A Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 6, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DENYING IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REFERRING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL JONATHAN CAPP; VACATING DECEMBER 9, 2011 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 2, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER RE: LETTER FROM DEFENDANTS DAVID COMPTON AND STEVEN COMPTON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER. The current trial dates are taken off calendar, plaintiffs have until November 28, 2011 to file their motion for summary judgment, and the Case Management Conference is continued from October 21, 2011 to February 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 73 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER FINDING DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT; VACATING OCTOBER 14, 2011 HEARING. Defendants are in contempt of the Court's order of August 30, 2011. As a sanction, defendants are fined, jointly and sev erally, the sum of $1000 per day, payable to the Clerk of the Court, beginning on the date of this order and continuing until such date as they comply with the Court's order. Defendants shall pay the attorney's fees and costs reasonab ly incurred by plaintiffs in filing the instant motion. Plaintiffs are directed to file, no later October 28, 2011, a memorandum and supporting declaration setting forth the fees and costs reasonably incurred. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 12, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER for Defendants Mash and New Ltd., Port 80 Ltd., Steven Compton, and David Compton to Submit Additional Information Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating Sanctions. Additional information due by 9/21/2011. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/19/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER FINDING DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT. No later than Friday, September 23, 2011, defendants shall file any opposition or other response to the motion. No later than Friday, Sep tember 30, 2011, plaintiffs shall file any reply. Unless the parties are otherwise informed, the Court will conduct a hearing on the motion on October 14, 2011, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 7. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER for Defendants to Submit Additional Information Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating Sanctions. Additional information due by 9/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/09/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 30, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER to File Additional Information re 65 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/19/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 55 Joint Letter re Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/14/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Phone Conference re 55 Letter re Discovery Disputes. Telephonic Hearing set for 6/13/2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/07/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER To Submit Additional Information re 52 Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/26/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER to Meet and Confer re Discovery Disputes re 50 Letter filed by GLBT, Ltd., Port 80, Ltd., David Graham Compton, IO Group, Inc., Channel One Releasing, Inc., Steven John Compton, Liberty Media Holdings, LLC., Mash and New, Ltd. Joint letter due 5/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/10/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME. The remaining deadlines and dates are extended as follows: Close of Fact Discovery - June 30, 2011; Deadline to Disclose Experts - June 30, 2011; Deadline to Disclose Rebuttal Experts - July 14, 2011; Close of Expert Discovery - August 5, 2011; Deadline to File Dispositive Motions - August 12, 2011; Deadline to File Status Conference Statement - August 19, 2011; Further Status Conference - August 26, 2011; Meet and Confer - October 11, 2011; Pretrial Conference - November 15, 2011; Trial Date - November 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 23, 2011.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME. The discovery cut off and the deadline to name experts are extended to March 31, 2011. The deadline to name rebuttal experts is extended to April 14, 2011. The expert discovery cut off is extended to May 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 28, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR COMPLETION OF ENE SESSION. The completion date for the ENE session is extended to November 13, 2010. Plaintiffs have waived any jurisdictional argument on the basis of defendants being physically present to attend a court appointed mediation. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 18, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/4/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/30/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS. Jonathan Charles Capp is substituted in place and in stead of Michael J. Niborski and Robert J. deBrauwere as counsel for defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Marc John Randaza's application is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IO Group, Inc. et al v. GLBT, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marc John Randaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channel One Releasing, Inc.
Represented By: Marc John Randaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Marc John Randaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLBT, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mash and New, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port 80, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven John Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Graham Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?