Levi Strauss & Co. v. Evisu International S.R.L. et al

Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.
Defendant: Evisu International S.R.L., Bestford (Hong Kong) Ltd. and Bestford USA, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv01292
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 6, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending deadline for service re 52 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/7/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending service deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 12, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to extend service deadline re 46 (cmc remains 4/22/11) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) Modified on 4/13/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
January 26, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2011 09:00 AM. (all trial dates are vacated) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 10, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension to serve (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 8, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: international process server re 32 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 21, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending deadlines re 30 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
May 26, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT BESTFORD USA TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levi Strauss & Co. v. Evisu International S.R.L. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.
Represented By: Gia L. Cincone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evisu International S.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestford (Hong Kong) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestford USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?