Bay Area Painters & Tapers Pension Trust Fund et al v. Advanced Interior Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters & Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Les Proteau, Charles Del Monte, District Council 16 Northern California Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Doug Christopher, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice & Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Marian Bourboulis and District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters & Allied Trades
Defendant: Advanced Interior Systems, Inc. and Robert Lee Brown
Case Number: 3:2010cv01305
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Robert Lee Brown in the amount of $11,076.56. Issued as per Chambers. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 29, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/30/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to joint request 31 , the case management conference scheduled for March 25, 2011 is continued to April 7, 2011, and, upon filing of the Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and dismissal of this action, the case management conference will stand vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. All parties shall appear telephonically at the Case Management Conference on November 12, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' request to continue the case management conference to November 12, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 7, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 9, 2010 to September 10, 2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties' stipulation on ADR is granted, and the matter is referred to mediation. The deadline for the ADR session is 90 days from the date of the order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 24, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Area Painters & Tapers Pension Trust Fund et al v. Advanced Interior Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters & Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Proteau
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Del Monte
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Christopher
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice & Journeyman Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Bourboulis
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters & Allied Trades
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Interior Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?