Levitt v. Yelp! Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Boris Y. Levitt, Tracy Chan, Astro Appliance Service, Renaissance Furniture Restoration, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, John Mercurio, Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, Celibre, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Bleeding Heart, LLC, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc., California Furnishings, Inc., Wag My Tail, Inc. and Professional Construction Group, Inc.
Defendant: Yelp! Inc.
Interested Party: Beck & Lee Business Trial Lawyers
Claimant: Jennifer Battoon
Case Number: 3:2010cv01321
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2014 Filing 104 CLERK'S Letter Spreading #103 Mandate to Counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 103 MANDATE of USCA as to #92 Notice of Appeal filed by Tracy Chan, John Mercurio, Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Boris Y. Levitt (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER of USCA denying petition for rehearing, and rejecting petition for rehearing en banc as to #92 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tracy Chan, John Mercurio, Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Boris Y. Levitt (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 101 USCA Opinion affirming the judgment of this District Court as to #92 Notice of Appeal filed by Tracy Chan, John Mercurio, Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Boris Y. Levitt. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
December 16, 2011 Filing 100 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 350.00 against Plaintiff re: #94 . (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form filed by Boris Y. Levitt for proceedings held on 10/14/11 before Judge Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 98 RESPONSE to PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO YELP! INC.'S BILL OF COSTS by Yelp! Inc.. (Beringer, Ashlie) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 97 Declaration of Amelia D. Winchester Declaration of Amelia D. Winchester in Support of Plaintiffs' Objections to Yelp! Inc.'s Bill of Costs filed byBoris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 96 OBJECTIONS to re #94 Bill of Costs Plaintifffs' Objections to Yelp! Inc.'s Bill of Costs by Boris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 95 USCA Case Number 11-17676 for #92 Notice of Appeal filed by Tracy Chan, John Mercurio, Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Boris Y. Levitt. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 94 BILL OF COSTS by Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Itemization of Costs)(Beringer, Ashlie) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 4, 2011 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all non-efilers. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 93 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #92 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 docket sheet)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #90 Judgment, #89 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Tracy Chan, Boris Y. Levitt, John Mercurio. Filing fee $ 455; Receipt No. 34611066564. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011); (USCA Case No. 11-17676)
November 1, 2011 Filing 91 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/14/11, before Judge EDWARD M. CHEN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2012. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 26, 2011 Filing 90 JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk Betty Lee on 10/26/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #77 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2011 before Edward M. Chen. Motion to Dismiss is taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Margo Gurule) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 87 RESPONSE to re #85 Opposition/Response to Motion, Yelp's Response to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections by Yelp! Inc.. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 86 REPLY (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byYelp! Inc.. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byBoris Y. Levitt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Evidentiary Objections)(Ongaro, David) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Yelp! Inc., #83 Stipulation, filed by Yelp! Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 83 STIPULATION re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR YELP! INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS by Yelp! Inc.. (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #81 Letter filed by Boris Y. Levitt. Plaintiffs' request is denied. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 81 Letter from Plaintiffs and Defendants Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Discovery Demand. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 80 Declaration of IAN MACBEAN in Support of #77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byYelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #77 ) (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 79 Declaration of S. ASHLIE BERINGER in Support of #77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byYelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #77 ) (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 78 Proposed Order GRANTING YELP'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS by Yelp! Inc.. (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Yelp! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/19/2011. Replies due by 8/26/2011. (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 76 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Marilyn H. Patel no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/11. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 74 Third Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint For 1) Violation of Business and Professions Code Section 17200; 2) Civil Extortion; and 3) Attempted Civil Extortion. NOTE: THIS DOCUMENT REPLACES DOCUMENT NO. 73 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR. against Yelp! Inc.. Filed byBoris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 5/23/2011) Modified on 5/24/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2011 Filing 73 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. 74***AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint for 1) Violation of Business & Professions Code Section 17200; 2) Civil Extortion; and 3) Attempted Civil Extortion against Yelp! Inc.. Filed byProfessional Construction Group, Inc., Bleeding Heart, LLC, Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Wag My Tail, Inc., California Furnishings, Inc., J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Astro Appliance Service, Boris Y. Levitt, Celibre, Inc., Tracy Chan, Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 5/23/2011) Modified on 5/24/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DEADLINES; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/18/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 71 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Deadlines by Boris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice. Any further amended complaint shall be filed within thirty (30) days of this order. Defendant shall file its answer within thirty (30) days of the filing of the amended complaint. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 69 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-7-11, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 68 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2011 before Marilyn H. Patel (Date Filed: 3/7/2011) re #59 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS filed byYelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #59 , #63 ) (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 8, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated***. Motion Hearing date of 01/31/2011 Date Terminated #55 Stipulation and Order, Set Hearings. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING Hearing on #59 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES to 3/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/7/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Hearing On Yelp! Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Actioin Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations by Yelp! Inc.. (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 64 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #59 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES filed byYelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terms of Service, #2 Exhibit Content Guidelines)(Related document(s) #59 ) (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 63 Reply to Opposition re #59 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES filed byYelp! Inc.. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 62 Memorandum in Opposition to #59 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike Class Action Allegations filed by Boris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2010 Filing 61 Proposed Order GRANTING YELP'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS by Yelp! Inc.. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 60 Declaration of S. ASHLIE BERINGER IN SUPPORT OF #59 YELP'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 12/17/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2010 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES filed by Yelp! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 58 SECOND AMENDED AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 17200 against Yelp! Inc.. Filed by Boris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/19/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 56 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED AND CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Boris Y. Levitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SECOND AMENDED AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 17200)(Ongaro, David) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER amending briefing schedules: Oppositions due 12/7/2010; Replies due 12/21/2010; Motion Hearing reset for 1/31/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before the Honorable Marilyn Hall Patel; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/4/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 54 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Modifying Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Boris Y. Levitt. (Winchester, Amelia) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
October 25, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. Release of Transcript Restriction date of 10/20/2010 Date Terminated #32 Transcript. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 53 Proposed Order re #51 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Yelp! Inc.. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 52 Declaration of S. ASHLIE BERINGER in Support of #51 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byYelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Yelp! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 50 NOTICE of Lien Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 708.410 by Jennifer Battoon (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE by Beck & Lee Business Trial Lawyers OF FILING ATTORNEYS PLEDGES OF JARED H. BECK AND ELIZABETH LEE BECK (Beck, Jared) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 48 FIRST AMENDED AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: (1) VIOLATION OF BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE Section 17200; (2) VIOLATION OF BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE Section 17500; (3) INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE BUSINESS ADVANTAGE against Yelp! Inc.. Filed by Boris Y. Levitt, Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/27/2010 (gba, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 Filing 47 Statement Attorney's Pledge for Lawrence D. Murray, John F. Henning III, and Robert C. Strickland by Boris Y. Levitt. (Murray, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 46 Statement Attorney's Pledge by Aaron Schur by Yelp! Inc.. (Schur, Aaron) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 45 Statement Attorney's Pledge by Susannah S. Wright by Yelp! Inc.. (Wright, Susannah) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 44 Statement Attorney's Pledge by Gail E. Lees by Yelp! Inc.. (Lees, Gail) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 43 Statement Attorney's Pledge by S. Ashlie Beringer by Yelp! Inc.. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 42 Statement Attorney's Pledge of David R. Ongaro by Boris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 41 Statement Attorney's Pledge of Amelia D. Winchester by Boris Y. Levitt. (Winchester, Amelia) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schur (Schur, Aaron) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER APPOINTING ONGARO BURTT LLP LEAD COUNSEL for plaintiffs; Amended consolidated complaint to be filed within 30 days; Responsive pleadings to be filed 30 days thereafter; SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/24/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER withdrawing Attorneys Benjamin Hansel Kleine, Michael G. Rhodes, Michael Graham Rhodes, Sarah Ruth Boot and Matthew Dean Brown as attorneys of record for defendant YELP!; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/23/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Susan Ashlie Beringer and [Proposed] Order (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Ashlie Beringer (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE vacating 8/23/2010 Case Management Conference before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 34 Statement Plaintiff Boris Y. Levitt's Discovery Plan by Boris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 33 Statement DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S STATEMENT ON PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by Yelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 32 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 19, 2010, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting (13) Motion to Consolidate Cases 3:10-cv-01321-MHP; granting (64) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:10-cv-02351-MHP; Supplemental discovery briefing to be submitted by 7/26/2010; See order for more details (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 Filing 30 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2010 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 7/19/2010) re Motions to Consolidate/Motions to Compel (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE by Yelp! Inc. Defendant Yelp! Inc.'s Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Civil L.R. 3-13) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE by Boris Y. Levitt Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Winchester, Amelia) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CIVIL LOCAL RULE 16-10(a) filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE CMCS AND DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/8/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byYelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 23 Reply Memorandum re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Yelp's Motion to Consolidate and Cross-Motion filed byCats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, to be completed within 45 days of decision on class certification; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/1/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Yelp! Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Selecting ADR Process (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification By Parties and Counsel (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 18 Declaration of LAWRENCE MURRAY in Support of #17 Declaration in Support, #16 Pretrial Memorandum, filed byBoris Y. Levitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 THROUGH 3)(Related document(s) #17 , #16 ) (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 17 Declaration in Support of #16 Pretrial Memorandum, OF DAVID R. ONGARO filed byBoris Y. Levitt. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 16 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO CATS AND DOGS CROSS-MOTION FOR DESIGNATION AS LEAD ACTION AND APPOINTMENT OF WESTON FIRM AND BECK & LEE AS INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL by Boris Y. Levitt. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CROSS-MOTION FOR: (A1) DESIGNATION OF CATS AND DOGS AS LEAD ACTION AND STAY OF LEVITT ACTION -OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE-(A2) CONSOLIDATION OF ACTIONS, DEEMING CATS AND DOGS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS THE OPERATIVE PLEADING (B) APPOINTMENT OF THE WESTON FIRM AND BECK & LEE AS INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL; AND C) SUBMISSION OF FULLY-BRIEFED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR HEARING filed byYelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 14 Opposition to #13 Yelp's Motion to Consolidate Cases and Cross-Motion by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Yelp's Motion to Consolidate and Cross-Motion, #2 Declaration of Gregory S. Weston in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, #3 Declaration of Jack Fitzgerald in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, #4 Declaration of Jared H. Beck in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, #5 Declaration of Elizabeth Lee Beck in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, #6 Proposed Order Denying Yelp's Motion to Consolidate and Granting Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion, #7 Certificate of Service)(Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/15/2010 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Yelp! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Brown, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE: Case Management Conference reset for 8/23/2010 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel; Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RELATING CASE C 10-2351 MEJ to this action; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/3/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Stipulation, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amelia D Winchester (Winchester, Amelia) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Raymond Ongaro (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 7 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) by Yelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE by Yelp! Inc. Defendant Yelp! Inc.'s Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (L.R. 3-13) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 31, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE by Yelp! Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 29, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2010 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yelp! Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Yelp! Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jeremy Stoppelman, Other Affiliate Russel Simmons, Other Affiliate Geoff Donaker, Other Affiliate Max Levchin, Other Affiliate Bessemer Venture Partners, Other Affiliate Benchmark Capital, Other Affiliate DAG Ventures, Other Affiliate Elevation Partners LP, Other Affiliate Admiral Insurance Company for Yelp! Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; No Process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 10-497777. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 34611044051). Filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE by Yelp! Inc. Defendant Yelp! Inc.'s Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (L.R. 3-13) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levitt v. Yelp! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Y. Levitt
Represented By: Amelia D Winchester
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Robert Close Strickland
Represented By: Lawrence Dale Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Chan
Represented By: Amelia D Winchester
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Robert Close Strickland
Represented By: Lawrence Dale Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astro Appliance Service
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renaissance Furniture Restoration
Represented By: Amelia D Winchester
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Robert Close Strickland
Represented By: Lawrence Dale Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mercurio
Represented By: Amelia D Winchester
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celibre, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bleeding Heart, LLC
Represented By: Amelia D Winchester
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Robert Close Strickland
Represented By: Lawrence Dale Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Furnishings, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wag My Tail, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Construction Group, Inc.
Represented By: Amelia D Winchester
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Robert Close Strickland
Represented By: Lawrence Dale Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Beck & Lee Business Trial Lawyers
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jennifer Battoon
Represented By: Paul Christopher Clifford,
Represented By: Mark Goldowitz
Represented By: Ryan Metheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp! Inc.
Represented By: S. Ashlie Beringer
Represented By: Susannah Stroud Wright
Represented By: Aaron Schur
Represented By: Gail E. Lees
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Benjamin Hansel Kleine
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Sarah Ruth Boot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?