Teleconference Systems LLC v. Tandberg, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Teleconference Systems LLC
Defendant: Tandberg, Inc, Avago Technologies U.S., Inc, Bayer Corporation, Ericsson, Inc. and One Communications Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv01325
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Protective Order 127 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/19/11. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST TO FILE EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE: Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/25/2011 01:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/18/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE re (250 in 3:09-cv-01550-JSW) Stipulation for extension of time to file claim construction brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/6/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 96 Stipulation to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Stipulation to Extend Claim Construction Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 90 Stipulation to Extend Claim Construction Schedule. Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/29/2011 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/22/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING re 87 Letter filed by Teleconference Systems LLC for extension of time to file settlement conference statement. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/9/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING 82 Stipulation filed by Teleconference Systems LLC. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/2/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING 79 Stipulation re Discovery Magistrate. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 20, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 76 Stipulation to Extend Joint Case Management Statement Deadlines. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/18/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE. Plaintiff to provide written settlement proposal by 10/15/10 and Dft to provide written response by 10/22/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/06/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Stipulation to Extend ADR Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Ericsson, Inc. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/7/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 28 Stipulation to Reset Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 25, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDINFG TIME TO ANSWER re 20 Stipulation filed by Ericsson, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 16 Stipulation filed by Tandberg, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 11 Stipulation filed by Ericsson, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teleconference Systems LLC v. Tandberg, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teleconference Systems LLC
Represented By: Robert Warren Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tandberg, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies U.S., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?