Mertens v. The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Lydia Mertens
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2010cv01457
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lydia Mertens. (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: #17 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND GRANTING REQUEST TO ADD COUNTERCLAIMANT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE PRIVATE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 38 STIPULATION of the Parties to Use of Private ADR; and Proposed Order by The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 37 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Robert S. Luft as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:, Case referred to mediation.Bench Trial set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 35 Memorandum in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF Supplemental Brief filed byThe Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 32 Supplemntal Brief in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Lydia Mertens. (Related document(s) #17 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/30/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Lydia Mertens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Supplemental Brief), #2 Affidavit Declaration of Julia Campins, #3 Proposed Order)(Campins, Julia) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 29 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2010 before Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/26/2010), Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2010 before Richard Seeborg; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 8/26/2010) re #17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Lydia Mertens.(Court Reporter Joan Columbini.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Address by Julia Campins (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE by Lydia Mertens re #17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF Notice of Erratum (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Lydia Mertens, The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 24 Reply Memorandum re #17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byLydia Mertens. (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byThe Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: #20 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ***FILED IN ERROR***SEE DOCUMENT #22 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: #20 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010) Modified on 8/2/2010 (cl, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2010 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] ORDER THEREON by The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 19 JOINT Report to Court pursuant to Rule 26(f) filed by Lydia Mertens, The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 7/29/2010) Modified on 8/2/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Lydia Mertens. (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Lydia Mertens. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/18/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 15 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Respond to Counterclaim by Lydia Mertens. (Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Campins (Campins, Julia) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lydia Mertens (Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: #11 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/26/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/26/10. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 9 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan and Request For Reassignment To A United States District Judge. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan identifying Other Affiliate Life Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CIGNA Corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation for The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Lydia Mertens byThe Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/13/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 5 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; [Proposed] Order Thereon by The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Publicover, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 4 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Lydia Mertens. (Feinberg, Daniel) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 6, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 7/26/2010 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 8/2/2010 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/29/2018) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2010 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 6, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - [Summons Issued] against The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 44611005026]. Filed by Plaintiff Lydia Mertens. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 6, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mertens v. The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Adrienne Clare Publicover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Mertens
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Represented By: Julia Campins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?