The Board of Trustees et al v. Paul T. Beck Contractors, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Cement Masons Vacation/Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California and Cement Masons Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Paul T. Beck Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01492
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JS6 Order Re: Stay of Case- Administrative Court Filing. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/17/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re (59 in 3:10-cv-01492-EDL) Stipulation, filed by Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Cement Masons Vacation/Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, Cement Masons Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund for Northern California Discovery due by 2/27/2012. Bench Trial set for 9/4/2012 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/22/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES into lead case C-10-1492-EDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 08/12/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY THE PRETRIAL ORDER re (38 in 3:10-cv-01493-EDL) Stipulation. The Court modifies the initial Case Management and Pretrial Order for Court Trial, doc #18 for cases 10-1492 and 10-1493 as follows: Initial expert disclosur es: 7/27/2011. Last day to supplement and/or correct previously made disclosures: 8/1/2011. Rebuttal expert disclosures: 8/10/2011. Discovery cut-off: 8/29/2011. Expert discovery cut-off: 8/29/2011. Last day to complete mediation pursuant to Cour t order: 10/28/2011. Last day to hear dispositive motions: 11/1/2011 at 9:00 AM. Last day to meet and confer prior to the pretrial conference: 1/6/2012. Last to file joint pretrial statements etc: 1/16/2012. Last day to file objections to exhibit s and witnesses or oppositions to motions in limine: 1/16/2012. Pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine: 2/7/2012 at 2:00 PM. Court trial: 2/27/2012 at 8:30 AM. The Court will adress the pre-trial schedule in the other cases if and when the cases are related to and consolidated with the cases currently before the Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/1/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011) Modified on 6/3/2011 (cgk, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Mediation re 30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/4/2011. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re (28 in 3:10-cv-01493-EDL) (28 in 3:10-cv-01492-EDL) Stipulation, filed by Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Judge Laporte on 2/25/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (28 in 3:10-cv-01493-EDL) Stipulation, filed by Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/20/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/16/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees et al v. Paul T. Beck Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons Vacation/Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Beck Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?