Robinson et al v. HSBC Bank USA

Plaintiff: Douglass Robinson and David Lau Yin Loong
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA
Case Number: 3:2010cv01494
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (corrected) setting cmc 7/30/10 @ 2:30 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER continuing cmc to 7/30/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. HSBC Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglass Robinson
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lau Yin Loong
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA
Represented By: Jason Lohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?