Perenon et al v. Paul Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery Perenon and Cheryl Ann Perenon
Defendant: Paul Financial, LLC, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, RBS Financial Products, Inc., Hartford Mortgage Services, Inc. and Noelle Kozak
Case Number: 3:2010cv01504
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
July 11, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE [re 40 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Initial Case Management Conference, currently scheduled for July 15, 2010, filed by RBS Financial Products, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/9/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2010)
July 8, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO MOVE FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 7, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 24, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 21, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 27 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by GMAC Mortgage, LLC. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perenon et al v. Paul Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Perenon
Represented By: David Pivtorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ann Perenon
Represented By: David Pivtorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Mark Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Financial Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelle Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?