M. Barbera & Figli, S.P.A., v. Vigo Importing Company
Plaintiff: M. Barbera & Figli, S.P.A.,
Defendant: Vigo Importing Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv01508
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 Request for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation and Injunction as modified by the Court. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/5/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation and approval to amended mediation date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/5/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline. Completion of Mediation is extended to 10-25-10. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/21/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 6, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. Barbera & Figli, S.P.A., v. Vigo Importing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Barbera & Figli, S.P.A.,
Represented By: Thomas W. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigo Importing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?