Ennova Direct, Inc. v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Ennova Direct, Inc.
Defendant: Kingston Technology Corporation, Transcend Information INC., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Verbatim Americas LLC and A-DATA Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01518
Filed: April 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT TRANSCEND INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/9/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/19/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY CORP. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/18/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Granting 257 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Victoria Hao filed by Kingston Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/04/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT VERBATIM AMERICAS LLC re 247 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Dft Verbatim Americas LLC filed by Ennova Direct, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/01/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT A-DATA TECHNOLOGY (USA). Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/15/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFFENDANT PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/24/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/28/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER VACATING REASSIGNMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/13/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2010.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/7/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ennova Direct, Inc. v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ennova Direct, Inc.
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Technology Corporation
Represented By: Duncan Palmatier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcend Information INC.
Represented By: E Patrick Ellisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Represented By: Sharon Audrey Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verbatim Americas LLC
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-DATA Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Johnny Cheng-Teh Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?