Gallion v. Apple, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Charlene Gallion
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv01610
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2012 Filing 74 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2012 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/9/2012). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 73 CLERKS NOTICE All parties shall appear telephonically at 11 a.m. for the Case Management Conference on August 9, 2012. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 72 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference filed by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 71 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 70 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
April 24, 2012 Filing 69 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINTLY filed by Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 67 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 66 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Jointly filed by Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
February 8, 2012 Filing 65 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 63 STIPULATION (Joint) and [Proposed] Order Regarding Confidentiality Designations by Apple, Inc. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 61 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Heather A. Moser NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL (Moser, Heather) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 58 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order Governing Production by Non-Party AT&T Mobility LLC by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 1, 2011 Filing 57 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT byApple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher K. Jones (Jones, Christopher) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Brady (Brady, Scott) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Wolff, III (Wolff, John) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER COMPLAINT (all actions) against Apple, Inc. Filed byCharlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 49 EXTENDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 50 NOTICE OF ADOPTION BY NON-PARTY 3M COMPANY OF TERMS OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED NOVEMBER 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/31/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 50 STIPULATION re 29 Protective Order Notice of Adoption by Non-Party 3M Company of Terms of Stipulated Protective Order Filed November 2, 2010, as Modified; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 49 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
April 27, 2011 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE Standby Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 20, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 4/20/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE GOVERNING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS AND GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 45 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Consolidation of Related Cases by Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 44 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE GOVERNING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 24, 2011 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/24/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 3/24/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 42 CLERKS NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE BY TELEPHONE. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 41 Letter from Dina Micheletti to Judge Seeborg. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (submitted jointly by all parties) filed by Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
January 21, 2011 ADR Remark: A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 4/20/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 605-477-3000 and use access code 560060. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/20/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/20/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not Reported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 1/19/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Jointly filed by Apple, Inc, Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE CASES C 10-1610 AND C 10-5895. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc re 35 Stipulation, 34 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Lunier, Samuel) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 35 STIPULATION re 34 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED by Apple, Inc. (Lunier, Samuel) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lunier, Samuel) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/29/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 32 ERRATA re 31 Stipulation and Proposed Order Appointing Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel by Charlene Gallion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Errata)(Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Appointing Interim Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel by Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 15, 2010 Filing 30 ADR Clerks Notice Setting a further ADR Phone Conference on 1/19/11 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific time. Please take note that all parties shall call 605-477-3000 and use access code 560060. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 12/15/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 28 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/28/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 10/29/2010). Further Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter unreported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 27 STIPULATION STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Apple, Inc. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 26 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order by Charlene Gallion. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 10/25/10. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 12/15/10 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Submitted Jointly) filed by Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 20, 2010 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 9/30/10 has been rescheduled to 10/25/10 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING Further Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RELATING CASES C 10-1610 RS AND C 10-3316 PVT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc re 21 Stipulation, 20 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 21 STIPULATION re 20 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED by Apple, Inc. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 19 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/29/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 7/29/2010). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter unreported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/29/2010)
July 26, 2010 ADR Remark: A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 9/30/10 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 7/26/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Jointly filed by Charlene Gallion. (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 16 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/26/10 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 13 Statement Apple Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc Apple Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-16 (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 11 Apple's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel James Boone Lunier NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PENELOPE A. PREOVOLOS, ANDREW DAVID MUHLBACH, HEATHER A. MOSER AND SAMUEL J. BOONE LUNIER (Lunier, Samuel) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 9 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Apple, Inc. (Lunier, Samuel) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: 7 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/20/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/20/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charlene Gallion re 1 Complaint (Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 15, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Parties by Charlene Gallion (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Samuel Conti on 4/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 SC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF AND DAMAGES: CLASS ACTION: JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Apple, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611044746.). Filed byCharlene Gallion. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallion v. Apple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Gallion
Represented By: Earl L. Bohachek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?