Marshall et al v. John Huffman IV, Real Content Media Group et al
Plaintiff: Preston D. Marshall and Demario D. Driver
Defendant: John Huffman IV, Real Content Media Group, Mariah Carey, Island Def Jam Music Group, Terius Youngdell Nash and Carlos McKinney
Case Number: 3:2010cv01665
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/18/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Permitting Telephonic Participation in Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on January 14, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER dismissing UMG. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/26/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY CUT-OFF 190 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER RE DISCOVERY SCHEDULE 184 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/5/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER UPON STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND TO ALLOW THE ANSWER AND COUNTER CLAIMS TO BE FILED BY REAL CONTENT GROUP LLC. TO STAND. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/12/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER dismissing cross claims. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER signed on 10/3/12 by Judge Illston granting extension to deadline to respond to Cross Complaint (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT HUFFMAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS 120 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
January 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/8/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING KEVIN B. WILLIAMS' MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE; DENYING KEVIN B. WILLIAMS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING ECF REGISTRATION; DENYING KEVIN B. WILLIAMS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting continuance (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING KEVIN B. WILLIAMS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING ECF REGISTRATION AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE AND SERVE COURT PAPERS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT ISLAND DEF JAM MUSIC GROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING KEVIN B. WILLIAMS' APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING KEVIN B. WILLIAMS' MOTION TO INTERVENE AND DENYING MR. WILLIAMS' REQUEST TO FILE A MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting application to serve by publication. Counsel is cautioned to accurately docket her filings. The application is not clearly identified on this docket. If there are any questions in the future as to how to properly identify a document please contact the court prior to filing. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall et al v. John Huffman IV, Real Content Media Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston D. Marshall
Represented By: Brittany S. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demario D. Driver
Represented By: Brittany S. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Huffman IV, Real Content Media Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariah Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Def Jam Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terius Youngdell Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?