Reyes et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Gustavo Reyes and Maria Teresa Guerrero
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01667
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER APPROVING FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS. Remaining settlement funds to the cy pres recipeint, the National Housing Law Project.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/28/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING re 144 Stipulation to Amend Settlement Agreement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/18/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL. Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval due by 1/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/5/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero RE 128 Notice of settlement and request to vacate supplemental class certification briefing; denying 72 Motion to Certify Class. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION TO FACILITATE FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. Supplemental briefing continued from 6/29/12 to 8/6/12. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/26/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: COURT-ORDERED MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/1/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION TO FACILITATE MEDIATION. Motion for Class Cert due by 3/21/2012. Replies due by 5/11/2012. Responses due by 4/23/2012. Court to set hearing date on the Motion for Class Cert. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/21/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Hearing and Briefing Schedule for Motion for Class Certification. Motion for Class Cert. due by 1/9/2012. Opposition due by 2/8/2012. Reply due by 2/22/2012. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/06/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR (1) LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, (2) EXTENSION OF TIME FOR WELLS FARGO DISCOVERY RESPONSES, AND (3) EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion for Class Cert. due by 9/12/2011. Opposition due by 10/12/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/23/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AS TO DISCOVERY AND FILING DEADLINE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION. Motion for Class Certification now due by 7/14/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AS TO DISCOVERY AND FILING DEADLINE FOR CLASS CERT. MOTION. Class Certification Motion due by 6/14/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/25/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AS TO DISCOVERY AND FILING DEADLINE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION. Class Certification Motion filing due by 5/31/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/21/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DISCOVERY AND FILING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion for Class Certification due by 4/29/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/19/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING re 27 Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaing filed by Maria Teresa Guerrero, Gustavo Reyes. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/21/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference re-set for 9/10/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/9/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 12 Motion to Remand and Vacating July 16, 2010 Hearing (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO REMAND.Opposition due by 6/11/2010. Replies due by 6/18/2010. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/02/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Reyes
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Guerrero
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Jan Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?