Lafever v. Acosta, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maria Lafever
Defendant: Acosta, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01782
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 174 Motion for Attorney Fees (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/5/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/15/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/18/2011 08:30 AM, in courtroom C. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO CONTACT COURT AND DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/30/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/27/2011 03:00 PM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/9/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER RE PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 80 Motion for Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating hearing 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 65 Motion for Leave to File (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/21/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting continuance of 46 Motion for Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DATES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/1/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/23/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/20/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 26 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/12/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/13/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafever v. Acosta, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lafever
Represented By: William Francis Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acosta, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?