Bentley v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Orin Bentley
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 3:2010cv01785
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/28/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND EXPERT DISCLOSURE DATES re 25 Stipulation filed by City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/7/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 Stipulation filed by City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong: Settlement Conference previously set on 3/29/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu continued to 5/24/2011 11:00 AM..Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/1/2011. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Stipulation filed by Orin Bentley. Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/22/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Stipulation filed by Orin Bentley. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/18/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Stipulation filed by Orin Bentley. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/2/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orin Bentley
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?