James v. Maguire et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Lamar James, Jr.
Defendant: Maguire, Greg Munks and Reynolds
Case Number: 3:2010cv01795
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER vacating telephonic status conference set for December 11, 2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case Settled. Status Conference set for 12/11/2012 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 11/27/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE PRISONER MEDIATION PROGRAM 43 33 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 25 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement conference set for December 16, 2011, is vacated and is to be reset after Plaintiff is released from County custody. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/29/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas 11/8/11 vacating writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of plaintiff at settlement conference on December 16, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/01/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 20 Writ Issued for attendance of plaintiff at settlement conference. Writ vacated. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 09/13/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2011: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Maguire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lamar James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?