Baker et al v. Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jason Baker, Sean Bosquett, Paul Graham and Paul Vannatta
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv01897
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2010 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 1 AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. All filings hereafter shall be made exclusively in Case No. 10-1811 RS. The Initial Case Management Conference shall be held on September 9, 2010, as originally scheduled in C 10-1811 RS. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC. (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE by Jason Baker re 8 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Notice of Entry of Order Granting John R. Fabry's Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fabry, John) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Fabry (Fabry, John) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE 6 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN FABRY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 21, 2010 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg. Judge Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/20/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney John Fabry to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611045743.) filed by Jason Baker, Sean Bosquett, Paul Graham, Paul Vannatta. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE to Plaintiff(s) Attorney(s) via e-mail or U.S. mail re: Failure to E-File/E-Mail re 1 Complaint & 3 Notice of Related Cases and in a separate pdf attachment the Civil Cover Sheet and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE re 10-1811 EMC by Jason Baker, Sean Bosquett, Paul Graham, Paul Vannatta (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Samuel Conti on 4/30/10. (Attachments: # 1 SC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611045289.). Filed byJason Baker, Sean Bosquett, Paul Vannatta, Paul Graham. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2010 Notified Counsel via telephone to e-file an administrative motion to relate cases into 10-1811 EMC the lower case. Re 3 Notice (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Baker
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Bosquett
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Graham
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Vannatta
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?