Leatherbury v. C&H Sugar Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Leatherbury
Defendant: C&H Sugar Company, Inc. and American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01969
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER continuing trial schedule. Jury Selection set for 1/22/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2012 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/12/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 8/12/2010 to 8/26/2010 at 3:30 PM re 19 Stipulation filed by Glenn Leatherbury. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/11/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING PRIVATE ADR, re, 15 . Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/27/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leatherbury v. C&H Sugar Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Leatherbury
Represented By: Kenneth N. Frucht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&H Sugar Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?