Rey v. C&H Sugar Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Rey
Defendant: C&H Sugar Company, Inc. and American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01970
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FOR RACE DISCRIMINATION AND FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME re 56 Stipulation filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc., David Rey, C&H Sugar Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER continuing trial schedule to the following: Jury Selection set for 11/19/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 11/19/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2012 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/12/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: TRANSFER LEATHERBURY V. C&H MATTER TO HON. SUSAN ILLSTON FOR ALL PURPOSES (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rey v. C&H Sugar Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rey
Represented By: Kenneth N. Frucht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&H Sugar Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?