Braggs v. U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chris Braggs
Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02031
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING 79 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 77 Notice Joint Request to Vacate Trial Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying request to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/15/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RULING on Objections. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 11, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/11/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 STIPULATION CONTINUING THE DEADLINE TO PARTICIPATE IN AN EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/11/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation Continuing the Deadline to Participate in an Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/10/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 29, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation to Continue October 1, 2010 Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 7 Stipulation TO CONTINUE AUGUST 27, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/2/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braggs v. U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Braggs
Represented By: S. John Ota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?