Kilopass Technology, Inc. v. Sidense Corporation

Plaintiff: Kilopass Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Sidense Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv02066
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2015 461 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES CALCULATION 460 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
September 25, 2014 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO SEAL 443 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 22, 2014 442 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART THE PARTIES' MOTIONS TO SEAL 431 435 437 440 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
August 12, 2014 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES 417 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 4, 2014 426 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' MOTIONS TO SEAL 418 419 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
June 9, 2014 415 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE PARTIES' MOTION TO SEAL 414 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
April 16, 2014 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 396 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request to Postpone Case Management Conference filed by Sidense Corporation. 4/23/14 case management conference is vacated.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/16/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2013 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ***ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 377 Motion to Stay, signed on 4/15/13 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 6, 2013 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY TAXABLE COSTS AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF THE CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS 373 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
December 18, 2012 370 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS 362 365 337 339 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
November 29, 2012 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART THE PARTIES' EX PARTE APPLICATIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL; RESETTING DEADLINES AND CONTINUING HEARING 344 347 350 352 336 338 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 16, 2012 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/16/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 14, 2012 355 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PENDING EX PARTE APPLICATIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 2, 2012 328 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 28, 2012 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE 289 290 291 292 293 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 5, 2012 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; RESETTING TIME FOR HEARING 279 in case 3:10-cv-02066-SI; 106 in case 3:11-cv-04112-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 24, 2012 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND ADJUSTING TRIAL SCHEDULE (275) in case 3:10-cv-02066-SI; (102) in case 3:11-cv-04112-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 16, 2012 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT 241 248 250 251 257 268 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
May 24, 2012 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 216 219 228 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 21, 2012 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 14, 2012 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT 212 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 1, 2012 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR WAIVER OF PRIVILEGE; ORDER UPON RECONSIDERATION 192 210 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 25, 2012 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Withdrawal of Jordan Trent Jones as Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/25/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 4, 2012 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT; ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL (190) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
December 27, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: mediation (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 19, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 3rd party depos (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 13, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 2, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
August 31, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
May 17, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: LETTER BRIEF MOTION TO COMPEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
March 23, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLASSIFYING PLAINTIFF'S INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 15, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 11, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CORRECTING FEB. 8, 2011 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REEXAMINATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 8, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REEXAMINATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
December 13, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 8, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUA SPONTE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 14, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISSING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
August 12, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting 9/10/10 as motion hearing date (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 10 Stipulation filed by Sidense Corporation. Signed by Judge James Larson on 7/12/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilopass Technology, Inc. v. Sidense Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kilopass Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L. Hogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidense Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?