Downs et al v. U.S. Foodservice Inc

Plaintiff: Loretta Downs and D'Andre Parker
Defendant: U.S. Foodservice Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv02163
Filed: May 19, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re 83 Proposed Order filed by U.S. Foodservice Inc. Case is closed.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
March 13, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Questions for March 16, 2012 Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
February 23, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED Order for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by D'Andre Parker, Loretta Downs. First amended complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
June 8, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 13, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING STATUS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
January 7, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC AND STATUS RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY TO 2/23/11 AT 10:30 A.M. re 34 Stipulation, filed by D'Andre Parker, Loretta Downs Status Conference set for 2/23/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/7/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 14, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION TO STAY re 27 Stipulation filed by D'Andre Parker, Loretta Downs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/14/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
August 2, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 14 Stipulation TO RESET CMC FROM 9/9/10 TO 9/29/10, filed by Loretta Downs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs et al v. U.S. Foodservice Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Downs
Represented By: Craig Justin Ackermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre Parker
Represented By: Craig Justin Ackermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Foodservice Inc
Represented By: Audrey Shen Chui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?