Manning v. AIS Services
Plaintiff: Tiera Manning
Defendant: AIS Services
Case Number: 3:2010cv02209
Filed: May 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/8/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Plaintiff's response, which must be in the form of a declaration signed under penalty of perjury, shall be filed not later than December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/15/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED; DENYING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than October 7, 2010. Motion for entry of default judgment denied as premature. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/24/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 7, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments, scheduling orders, attachments, plaintiff's affidavit and this order upon the defendant. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 21, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. AIS Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiera Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIS Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?