Velarde et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Josefino Velarde and Carmelita Mendoza Velarde
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Goldpointe Financial Services and First American LoanStar Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv02255
Filed: May 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the matter is remanded to the Superior Court of California, in and for the County of San Mateo. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/22/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICES' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS/ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STA TEMENT; VACATING HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs' first cause of action is dismissed without leave to amend; plaintiffs' third cause of action, to the extent said cause of action is based on payment of secret kic kbacks, is dismissed with leave to amend; plaintiffs' fourth cause of action is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than September 24, 2010. The hearing on defendants' motion is vacated; the case management conference is continued to December 10, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties' stipulation to participate in mediation is granted; mediation must be complete within 90 days of the filing of an answer by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., and First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC, f/k/a First American Loanstar Trustee Services LLC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 1, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON FIRST AMERICANS MOTION TO DISMISS. Given the similarity of issues presented in the motions to dismiss filed, respectively, by defendants First American LoanStar Services, LLC ("First American") and Wells Fargo B ank N.A. ("Wells Fargo"), the hearing on First Americans motion is CONTINUED from August 27, 2010 to September 3, 2010, the date on which Wells Fargo's motion is scheduled to be heard. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Defendant First American LoanStar Trustee Services' Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' complaint is denied as moot, and the July 30, 2010 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010) Modified on 7/8/2010.
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS/ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; VACATING HEARING. Defendants' motion is denied as moot, and the July 30, 2010 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velarde et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefino Velarde
Represented By: Marc C. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelita Mendoza Velarde
Represented By: Marc C. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Casey John McTigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldpointe Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American LoanStar Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?