Cazet et al v. Epps et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Cazet, Alumni Athletics USA, LLC and Alumni Athletics USA, Inc.
Defendant: Toppa Epps, Cammeron Ripley and Edward Hayman
Case Number: 3:2010cv02460
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING 191 STIPULATION Dismissing Entire Case. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 130 to remove incorrectly filed documents; Docket Numbers 114 through 119-4. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/27/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on 105 First MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/13/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 101 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cutoff. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/10/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE APRIL 29, 2011 DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/6/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER on 89 Joint Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by Robert L. Cazet, Alumni Athletics USA, Inc., Alumni Athletics USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 84 Letter, filed by Cammeron Ripley, Toppa Epps, Edward Hayman. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/31/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 81 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 03/11/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 Stipulation Modifying Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/1/2011. Expert Witness List due by 5/7/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 67 Stipulation to Amend Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 61 Stipulation TO STRIKE FROM RECORD SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST ROBERT L. CAZET, ET AL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/8/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 28, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 Stipulation Modifying Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 13, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 5 Motion for TRO (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 10, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 9, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cazet et al v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Cazet
Represented By: Bryan W. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alumni Athletics USA, LLC
Represented By: Bryan W. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alumni Athletics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan W. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toppa Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cammeron Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Hayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?