Ottovich et al v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Ottovich and Mark Ottovich
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC and Chase Bank
Case Number: 3:2010cv02842
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND TO OBEY REASONABLE COURT ORDERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/03/12. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SECOND ORDER RE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DEADLINES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER REGARDING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE on September 27, 2012 at 1:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/24/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER REGARDING Further Settlement Conference. Parties shall exchange written settlement demands, advise Court of expected participants at September 27 further settlement conference and lodge updated settlement status reports by 5:00 PM, September 21. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/12/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER STAYING ACTION AND SETTING NEW PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 10/9/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 10/9/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 2, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 15, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (7/9/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (7/2/2012). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER STAYING ACTION AND SETTING THIRD CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PROPOSED TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re 114 Show Cause Hearing - Non Evidentiary,, Set Hearings, (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REGARDING SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND TRIAL ON SEPTEMBER 6. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 2, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/6/2011 07:30 AM. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 31, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING AS MOOT IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE "# 5". Signed by Judge Alsup on August 18, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Alsup terminating 82 Motion in Limine; terminating 83 Motion in Limine; terminating 84 Motion in Limine; terminating 85 Motion in Limine; terminating 86 Motion in Limine; terminating 87 Motion for Disclosure (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENTS REQUIRED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 12, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 6, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING NORMAN NEWHOUSE'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Alsup granting 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Norman Charles Newhouse terminated (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING SUBSTITUTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 11, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADVANCING HEARING AND REQUIRING ATTENDANCE OF NORMAN NEWHOUSE, CRAIG MAR, MARK AND HARVEY OTTOVICH, AND DEFENSE COUNSEL Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION CUT-OFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 7, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup denying 50 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING NORMAN NEWHOUSE AND CRAIG MAR TO THE STATE BAR, JUDGE CHESNEY, AND REGARDING FUTURE FILINGS IN THIS ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING RESPONSES TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 15, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 3, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup granting 23 Ex Parte Application (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ottovich et al v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Ottovich
Represented By: Craig Henry Mar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ottovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Theodore Emery Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: Theodore Emery Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?