Kos Media LLC et al v. Research 2000 et al

Plaintiff: Kos Media LLC and Markos Moulitsas Zuniga
Defendant: Research 2000 and Delair D. Ali
Case Number: 3:2010cv02894
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DEFAULT JUDGMENT, Motions terminated: 41 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Ali and Research 2000 filed by Markos Moulitsas Zuniga, Kos Media LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/16/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION re 38 Status Report filed by Markos Moulitsas Zuniga, Kos Media LLC Motions due by 2/22/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/26/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/22/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT RESEARCH 2000. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/19/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/4/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CMC; ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/11/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 10 Stipulation filed by Markos Moulitsas Zuniga, Kos Media LLC Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/30/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING CMC & RELATED DEADLINES re 8 Stipulation, filed by Research 2000, Delair D. Ali. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/8/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kos Media LLC et al v. Research 2000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kos Media LLC
Represented By: Nathan Moore Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markos Moulitsas Zuniga
Represented By: Nathan Moore Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research 2000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delair D. Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?