Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. Paul's Dairy Distributor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Defendant: Paul's Dairy Distributor, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02938
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 WRIT of Execution issued (San Francisco County) as to Paul's Dairy Distributor, Inc.; $40,048.44. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 WRIT of Execution issued (San Francisco County) as to Paul's Dairy Distributor, Inc.; $39,749.78. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WRIT of Execution issued (San Mateo County) as to Paul's Dairy Distributor, Inc.; $39,749.78. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup adopting Report and Recommendations as to 25 Report and Recommendations. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. Paul's Dairy Distributor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul's Dairy Distributor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?