Parrish et al v. Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Parrish, Bob Grant, Roy Lee Jefferson, Walter Beach, Clinton Jones, Walter Roberts, III, Clifton McNeil, Marvin Cobb, John Brodie, Chuck Bednarik and Paul Hornung
Defendant: Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP and McKool Smith, PC
Case Number: 3:2010cv03200
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE FINAL REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 10, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER APPOINTING CY PRES AND RE EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 2, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND ORDER RE CERTAIN RECIPIENTS re 137 Status Report,,, filed by Clifton McNeil, John Brodie, Paul Hornung, Roy Lee Jefferson, Marvin Cobb, Clinton Jones, Bob Grant, Walter Roberts, III, Walter Beach, Bernard Parrish, Chuck Bednarik. Status Report due by 8/22/2014. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/19/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TENTATIVE ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Alsup granting 118 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 119 Motion for Settlement (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS; SETTING FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING DATE; AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF NOTICE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part 112 Motion to Certify Class for Settlement Purposes.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE TAXED COSTS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 93 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 6/15/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/21/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE 12/7/2010 LETTER FROM DEFENDANT MCKOOL SMITH, PC [re 72 Letter filed by McKool Smith, PC]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING MANATT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MCKOOL'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RELATED CASE OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish et al v. Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Parrish
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Grant
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Lee Jefferson
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Beach
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Jones
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Roberts, III
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton McNeil
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Cobb
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brodie
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Bednarik
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hornung
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKool Smith, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?