Sanchez v. Andruss et al
Plaintiff: Julio Cesar Sanchez
Defendant: Dallas Andruss, Sherri Kinney, J. Vanderhooven, G. A. Kelley and Francisco Jacquez
Case Number: 3:2010cv03213
Filed: July 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 27, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 43 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF INMATE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED For June 25, 2013 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/31/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING MAY 10, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ***Please disregard. Entered in error.
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PLEASE DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR.
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 28, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion to extend the discovery cut-off: defendants' opposition or other response shall be filed on or before March 20, 2013; (2) plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before March 22, 2013, on which date the matter will stand submitted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 13, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESPONSE, REPLY. The hearing on the motion for summary judgment is continued from March 15, 2013 to April 26, 2013. The response is due April 6, 2013; the reply is due April 12, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 48 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESPONSE, REPLY AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on the motion for summary judgment is continued to March 15, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE:STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENTMENT CONFERENCE. The settlement conference in this case is continued to March 2013, Judge Spero's calendar permitting. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF INMATE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 9/25/12 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/20/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/20/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO ATTEND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. It is further ordered that all parties are to appear telephonically at the April 20, 2012 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff will have until March 12, 2012, within which to file a Third Amended Complaint in this case. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 14, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The claims against Jacquez are dismissed with leave to amend. Sanchez's Third Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than February 10, 2012. The Case Management Co nference currently scheduled for February 10, 2012 is continued to April 20, 2012. The parties shall file a joint case management statement no later than April 13, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff has until November 25, 2011 to file a second amended complaint. The Case Management Conference, currently scheduled for November 4, 2011, is continued to February 10, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 13, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S ANSWER. Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff shall have until October 10, 2011 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/26/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND SERVICE; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The FAC shall be served on defendants Andruss, Kinney, Vanderhooven, and Kelley. The second and third causes of action are dismissed without leave to amend. The first c ount, as to defendant Jacquez, is dismissed with leave to amend. The Second Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed by August 26, 2011. A case management conference is set for November 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/5/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURTS STANDING ORDERS. Plaintiff shall file chambers copy of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/15/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S SERVICE DEADLINE AND DEFENDANT'S ANSWER. Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff will have until June 7, 2011 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/17/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before May 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/20/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Pursuant to stipulation, the time for the filing of an amended complaint in this case is extended to and including April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/26/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 27, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Extending deadline for effecting service of summons and complaint by 90 days nunc pro tunc from November 20, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Andruss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Cesar Sanchez
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Andruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vanderhooven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. A. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?