CTIA - The Wireless Association v. The City and County of San Francisco, California

Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco, California
Case Number: 3:2010cv03224
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER TO MOLLY DWYER, CLERK OF COURT, NINTH CIRCUIT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/20/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 10, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/10/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
January 3, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 107 Motion for Attorney Fees.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
November 21, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATED APPLICATION TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND DUE DATES FOR OPPOSITION AND REPLY re 112 Stipulation, filed by The City and County of San Francisco, California (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 9, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO BRING MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS re 101 Stipulation filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 7, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FOLLOWUP [re 92 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]. Please respond by NOON on 11/9/2011. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 27, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT REQUEST [re 92 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/27/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE [re 72 Exhibits, filed by The City and County of San Francisco, California, 71 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by The City and County of San Francisco, California, 70 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by The City and County of San Francisco, California, 73 Exhibits, filed by The City and County of San Francisco, California]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF LETTER re Received Document (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 17, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION re 60 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 14, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE re 60 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 12, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE by Hon. William Alsup denying 77 Motion Leave to file amicus brief.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
June 16, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FURTHER STAY AND BRIEFING. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/16/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 7, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE [re 46 Stipulation filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/7/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING TEMPORARY STAY AND VACATING PRESENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2011 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 11, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF TERRENCE DEE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF JANE THORPE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF SEAMUS DUFFY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 21, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
October 27, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/27/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
September 9, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTIA - The Wireless Association v. The City and County of San Francisco, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Represented By: Robert Allan Mittelstaedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco, California
Represented By: Vince Chhabria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?