Mid Century Insurance Company v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Mid Century Insurance Company
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2010cv03228
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/26/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and AGREEMENT OF COMPROMISE and Order. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/9/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying the parties joint request that all current dates be vacated. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/16/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Status Conference set for 1/21/11 is continued to 9/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/21/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2010 is continued to 1/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/26/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/26/2010 (tdm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid Century Insurance Company v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Mary Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?