Ortega v. Rodenspiel et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Alejandro Ortega
Defendant: Kurt Rodenspiel, San Mateo Police Department and City of San Mateo, California
Case Number: 3:2010cv03239
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 118 Motion to Vacate. The July 16, 2013 at 2:00pm hearing is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/7/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 48 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 52 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will enter Judgment by separate Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF CRIMINAL APPEAL. All trial and pretrial dates are vacated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/3/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 65 Stipulation to Schedule a Case Management Conference; denying 66 Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Special Case Management Conference to Reschedule Motions for Summary Judgment and Trial. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER Pre-Filing Conference set for 4/13/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motions heard by 7/10/2012 or as set at Pre-Filing Conference. Jury Selection set for 9/4/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvon ne Gonzalez Rogers. 10 day Jury Trial set for 9/4/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER re 37 Stipulation and Order re MSJ briefing schedule - Reply to opposition due 6/1/12. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MOFIDY THE DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (AMENDED) filed by Kurt Rodenspiel, City of San Mateo, California, San Mateo Police Department. Motion due: 3/26/12. Opp: 4/9/12. Reply: 4/13/12. Hrg: 4/27/12. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 Stipulation Extending Time for Parties' Disclosures and Depositions of Experts filed by Joseph Alejandro Ortega. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 3/9/11 AT 1:30 P.M. re 13 Ex Parte Application to Continue Case Management Conference and Filing Dates, and Proposed Order filed by Joseph Alejandro Ortega Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/7/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 11 Proposed Order filed by Joseph Alejandro Ortega Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/24/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 9 Proposed Order filed by Joseph Alejandro Ortega. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Rodenspiel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Alejandro Ortega
Represented By: Geoffrey Rotwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Rodenspiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Mateo, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?