In re Oracle Corporation Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: Lisa Galaviz and Philip T Prince
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Charles L. Phillips, Charles E. Phillips, Jr., Naomi O. Seligman and Oracle Corporation
Interested Party: Jerry K. Cimmet, John M. Kelson and Scott Ozaki
Case Number: 3:2010cv03392
Filed: August 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Filing 108 FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/30/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 107 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2013 before Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 9/26/2013) re (33 in 3:11-cv-04493-RS) MOTION for Settlement (Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Settlement and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Lisa Galaviz, Philip T. Prince, (102 in 3:10-cv-03392-RS) MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement filed by Lisa Galaviz. (Court Reporter Candce Yount.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 106 Declaration of Luis Montano Regarding Notice filed byJeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 105 Declaration of Philip T. Besirof Regarding Notice filed byJeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 104 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING THE TIME ON MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT [#102] for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 103 REPLY (re #102 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement ) (Plaintiffs' Notice of No Opposition or Objections to Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement) filed byLisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 102 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement filed by Lisa Galaviz. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/5/2013. Replies due by 9/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 101 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE. Final Approval Hearing for 9/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2013: #1 Exhibit A) (cl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/17/2013 (cl, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2013 Filing 99 Minute Entry: Motion for Settlement Hearing held on 7/11/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 7/11/2013). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 98 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 97 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 96 MOTION for Settlement (Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Settlement and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Lisa Galaviz, Philip T Prince. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 6/20/2013. Replies due by 6/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Settlement, #2 Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 95 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT filed by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 94 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 93 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Statement) filed by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 92 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Status Report filed by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
November 6, 2012 Filing 90 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 Filing 89 STATUS REPORT UPDATED JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 88 STATUS REPORT Updated Joint Status Report by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 87 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #85 TO STAY ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/8/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
February 7, 2012 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY ACTION filed by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #83 TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER COMPLAINT. Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/6/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 83 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] to Extend Time for Filing Amended Consolidated Shareholder Complaint by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 81 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER COMPLAINT by Lisa Galaviz. (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING ORACLE'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 78 Statement of Recent Decision by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE by Lisa Galaviz of Supplemental Material Re: Motions to Dismiss (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RELATING CASES C 10-3392 AND C 11-4493. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 74 RESPONSE (re #72 MOTION to Relate Case ) Response to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byScott Ozaki. (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated*** Release of Transcript Restriction date of 09/07/2011 Date Terminated #71 Transcript. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE by Philip T Prince re #72 MOTION to Relate Case, #51 Order,, Create Case Association,, Set Hearings, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Relate Case, #2 Order filed 2/8/11)(Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Philip T Prince. (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-2-11, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number Y. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 70 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 6/2/2011) re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Oracle Corporation, #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Naomi O. Seligman, Jeffrey O. Henley, Safra Catz, H Raymond Bingham, Lawrence J. Ellison, Michael J. Boskin, Hector Garcia-Molina, Charles E. Phillips, Jr., Jeffrey S. Berg, Donald L. Lucas, Further Case Management Conference held on 6/2/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 6/2/2011).(Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles L. Phillips, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 68 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING THE TIME ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 67 REPLY (re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byJeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 66 Declaration of Jordanna G. Thigpen in Support of #64 Opposition/Response to Motion, TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT filed byLisa Galaviz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #64 ) (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 65 Request for Judicial Notice re #64 Opposition/Response to Motion, TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT filed byLisa Galaviz. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 64 RESPONSE (re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byLisa Galaviz. (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE: BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 62 STIPULATION RE Briefing on Defendants' Motions To Dismiss by Lisa Galaviz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 61 Declaration of Philip T. Besirof in Support of #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byJeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) #58 , #59 ) (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 60 Request for Judicial Notice re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byJeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Related document(s) #58 , #59 ) (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Oracle Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #56 EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 56 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 55 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Action Complaint against Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Oracle Corporation, Charles L. Phillips, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman. Filed byLisa Galaviz. (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 53 Certificate of Interested Entities by Philip T Prince (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Lisa Galaviz. (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS C 10-3392 AND C 10-4233 APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF AND RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 50 Proposed Order re #49 Stipulation CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF AND RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 49 STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF AND RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE by Lisa Galaviz of Change of Firm Name (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 47 Proposed Order re #46 Stipulation Consolidating Actions, Appointing Co-Lead Counsel, and Setting Schedule for Filing of and Response to Consolidated Complaint by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 1/27/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2011 Filing 46 STIPULATION Consolidating Actions, Appointing Co-Lead Counsel, and Setting Schedule for Filing of and Response to Consolidated Complaint by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 1/27/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: #32 DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/03/2011.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 2, 2010 Filing 44 Minute Entry:Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2010 before Richard Seeborg; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 12/2/2010) re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Oracle Corporation.(Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 42 REPLY to Plaintiff's #39 Opposition to Oracle's #32 MOTION to Dismiss by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher M. Ing in Support of Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 11/18/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2010 Filing 41 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #42 . *** Reply to Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byOracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher M. Ing In Support of Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 11/18/2010) Modified on 11/18/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2010 Filing 40 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Rule 26 Deadline by Lisa Galaviz. (Edling, Matthew) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 10, 2010 Filing 39 Memorandum in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byLisa Galaviz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Galaviz, #2 Objections to Evidence, #3 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ***FILED IN ERROR***PLEASE SEE DOCKET #38***STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Modified on 11/2/2010 (cl, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 35 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Selecting ADR Process by Lisa Galaviz. (Edling, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 34 Proposed Order Granting Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Oracle Corporation. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 33 Declaration of Philip T. Besirof in Support of Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byOracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Oracle Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Oracle Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: #24 SCHEDULING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/4/10.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Hearing Administrative Motion to Set Hearing and Sequence Issues for Motion to Dismiss filed byLisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE by John M. Kelson Notice of Representation in related case (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE by Jerry K. Cimmet Notice of Representation in related case (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RELATING CASES C 10-3392 AND C 10-4233. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/27/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2010: #1 Appendix Proof of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2010 Filing 26 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Set Hearing and Sequence Issues for Motion to Dismiss by Oracle Corporation. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 25 Declaration of Jordan Eth In Support of Administrative Motion to Set Hearing and Sequence Issues for Motion to Dismiss filed byOracle Corporation. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION for Hearing Administrative Motion to Set Hearing and Sequence Issues for Motion to Dismiss, MOTION filed by Oracle Corporation. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle Corporation (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 22 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Oracle Corporation. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 21 STIPULATION Regarding Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Oracle Corporation. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Oracle Corporation. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Jeffrey S. Berg waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by H Raymond Bingham waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Michael J. Boskin waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Safra Catz waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Lawrence J. Ellison waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Hector Garcia-Molina waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Jeffrey O. Henley waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Donald L. Lucas waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Charles E. Phillips, Jr waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Galaviz. Service waived by Naomi O. Seligman waiver sent on 8/9/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: #8 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/8/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 5 STIPULATION Regarding Coordination of Time to Respond to Complaint by Oracle Corporation. (Besirof, Philip) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Galaviz. Oracle Corporation served on 8/5/2010, answer due 8/26/2010. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT (Verification to Complaint) by Lisa Galaviz. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/2/10. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Jeffrey S. Berg, H Raymond Bingham, Michael J. Boskin, Safra Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Donald L. Lucas, Charles L. Phillips, Charles E. Phillips, Jr, Naomi O. Seligman ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611048825.). Filed byLisa Galaviz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Oracle Corporation Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Galaviz
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Matthew Kendall Edling
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip T Prince
Represented By: Jerry K. Cimmet
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Berg
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Raymond Bingham
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Boskin
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safra Catz
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Ellison
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Garcia-Molina
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey O. Henley
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L. Lucas
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Phillips
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi O. Seligman
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley
Represented By: James C. Maroulis
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Philip T. Besirof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jerry K. Cimmet
Represented By: Jerry K. Cimmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John M. Kelson
Represented By: Jerry K. Cimmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott Ozaki
Represented By: Christopher L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?