Dilbert v. Martel
Plaintiff: Clifford Dilbert
Defendant: M. Martel
Case Number: 3:2010cv03396
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING SECOND RULE 60(b) MOTION 25 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING RULE 60(b) MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2011: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilbert v. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Dilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?