Quatela v. Stryker Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Sue Quatela
Defendant: Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv03422
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/12/2012 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/3/2012. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (cl, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Selection set for 1/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/27/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
August 18, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 44 GRANTING REQUEST TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
December 17, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 9 GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
October 22, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FAILURE TO APPEAR. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/22/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 2, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 21 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quatela v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Quatela
Represented By: Miles Baker Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Ralph A. Campillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Represented By: Ralph A. Campillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?