Huntair, Inc. et al v. Gladstone et al
Plaintiff: Huntair, Inc. and CLPK, LLC
Defendant: Seth Gladstone, Steve Moser, Lorna Gladstone, David Langer and L4 Strategies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03450
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER continuing 07/18/11 case management conference to 11/14/11 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Parties to meet and confer and file a joint case management conference statement by 11/07/11. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/14/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re 85 Notice of Mutual Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Huntair, Inc. and CLPK, LLC and by Defendants Seth Gladstone and Lorna Gladstone. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/06/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re: 82 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Steve Moser. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/18/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/25/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Counterdefendant's Time to Respond to the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/20/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 4/25/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/31/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Counterdefendant's Time to Respond to Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/18/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Case Management Conference set for 04/11/11 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint case management statement due by 04/04/11. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/08/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/25/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re: 55 56 discovery dispute. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/22/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 39 Defendant Moser's Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting re 47 Continuance of Hearing Date and Reply Deadline. Motion Hearing continued to 2/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/11/11. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntair, Inc. et al v. Gladstone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntair, Inc.
Represented By: James Goldberg, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLPK, LLC
Represented By: James Goldberg, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Gladstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Gladstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L4 Strategies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?