Sarbaz v. Wachovia Bank
Plaintiff: Afhsin Sarbaz
Defendant: Wachovia Bank
Case Number: 3:2010cv03462
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2011 Filing 36 Notice of Withdrawal of #31 Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Defendant Wachovia (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 Stipulation, filed by Wachovia Bank, Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/1/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 34 STIPULATION re #31 MOTION for Attorney Fees Stipulation To Continue Hearing Date On Defendant Wachovia's Motion For Award of Attorneys' Fees by Wachovia Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Continuance On Hearing Date of Defendant Wachovia's Motion)(Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 3/31/2011) Modified on 4/1/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 Filing 33 BILL OF COSTS by Wachovia Bank. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 32 Request for Judicial Notice re #31 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byWachovia Bank. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 31 WITHDRAWN PER #36 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Wachovia Bank. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raymond M. Collins ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 Filing 30 JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on March 3, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #22 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE - hearing 3/4/2011 at 10:00a.m. on motion to dismiss is vacated. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 27 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's SAC ) filed byWachovia Bank. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 26 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** NOTICE of Change of Address by Ali Nehme Re- Notice of Change Of Address (Nehme, Ali) (Filed on 2/15/2011) Modified on 2/17/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ali Nehme (Nehme, Ali) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 24 Memorandum in Opposition To #22 Defendant Wachovia's ' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed byAfhsin Sarbaz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nehme, Ali) (Filed on 2/8/2011) Modified on 2/9/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's SAC filed byWachovia Bank. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's SAC filed by Wachovia Bank. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting MTD SAC)(Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT Secon Amended Complaint against Wachovia Bank. Filed byAfhsin Sarbaz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ali Nehme, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Nehme, Ali) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #12 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 19 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2010 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/5/2010) re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Wachovia Bank. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated- case management conference continued at #19 Motion Hearing. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 18 Reply to Opposition re #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Wachovia Bank. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2010 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Wachovia Bank. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER continuing hearing re #15 Stipulation, filed by Wachovia Bank,on #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint>. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/7/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Continue Hearing Date by Wachovia Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance on the Hearing Date of Defendant Wachovia's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #12 Motion To Dismiss filed byAfhsin Sarbaz. (Nehme, Ali) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byWachovia Bank. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Wachovia Bank. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Further Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Wachovia Bank. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to extend time to respond re #9 Stipulation filed by Wachovia Bank. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Further Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More Than 30 days by Wachovia Bank. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 16, 2010. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond By not More Than 30 days by Wachovia Bank and Afhsin Sarbaz. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Wachovia Bank. (Collins, Raymond) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wachovia Bank identifying Other Affiliate Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, Other Affiliate World Savings Bank, FSB, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wachovia Bank. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (jury demand by Plaintiff) (no process) from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C10-00859. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611049056). Filed by Wachovia Bank. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2010: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarbaz v. Wachovia Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afhsin Sarbaz
Represented By: Ali Nehme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank
Represented By: Raymond Mark Collins
Represented By: Mark Tyler Flewelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?