Tan et al v. Coast Crane Company et al
Plaintiff: Yu Lian Tan and Zhi Bin Peng
Defendant: Coast Crane Company, Oshkosh Specialty Vehicles, Inc., Xi Shan Zhu, Kwan Wo Ironworks, Inc. and JLG Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03570
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER APPROVING STIUPLATION TO DISMISS. The action against defendant Coast Crane Company is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties are directed to file, no later than October 11, 2013, an updated Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties are directed to file, no later than August 23, 2013, an updated Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 1, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties are directed to file, no later than July 3, 2013, an updated Joint Status Report, apprising the Court as to the status of the settlement. If a global settlement has no t been reached by said date, the parties are further directed to apprise the Court therein as to a time frame within which the parties, including the lienholder, are available to participate in a settlement conference to be conducted by a magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The April 2, 2013 pretrial conference date and the April 15, 2013 trial date are vacated. Plaintiffs and Coast Crane are directed to file, no later than May 17, 2013, a Joint Status Report apprising the Court as to the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 22, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT COAST CRANE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. To the extent the motion seeks summary judgment as to the Third Cause of Action, the motion is granted, and Coast Crane shall have judgment in its favor as to the Third Cause of Action. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 15, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANT COAST CRANE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JLG'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT COAST CRANE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. No later than January 18, 2013, plaintiffs shall file any surreply, not to exceed seven pages in length, exclusive of exhibits. The hearing on Coast Crane's motion is continued from January 11, 2013 to February 1, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 8, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING WILLIAM KRONENBERG'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT COAST CRANE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MATTHEW J. KRACHT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. Matthew J. Kracht is terminated as counsel for defendant Coast Crane Company, and Kevin P. Cody is substituted as counsel for Coast Crane Company. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 27, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/16/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/4/2011. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tan et al v. Coast Crane Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Lian Tan
Represented By: John F. Vannucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhi Bin Peng
Represented By: John F. Vannucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Crane Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oshkosh Specialty Vehicles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xi Shan Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwan Wo Ironworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Susan E. Foe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?